+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time