+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 2, 2007, 12:00PM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Hearing Cancelled
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 TO HSA 1 FOR HA 2, HSA 1 FOR HA 2, AS AMENDED ADOPTED
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Tax Reform
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (83)
Type:
Primary Sponsor