+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 30, 2013, 1:00PM, SCR 1
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate General Laws
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 150
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Urban Issues
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor