+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 13, 2007 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 155 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 155 NOES: 0
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AS AMENDED
On May 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 23, 2007, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 157 NOES: 1
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor