+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session - No Action Taken
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor