+ − Actions (21)
On May 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred: Budget Control Committee
On May 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Aging, Families & Mental Health
On April 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 001
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 2, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review and Government Reform
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On March 28, 2001 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 7 ADOPTED
- HS Adopted in House
- House Substitute Offered
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS WITH HCA 1
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Social Services, Medicaid and the Elderly
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor