+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor