+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 12, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SS ADOPTED AYES: 152 NOES: 0
- Reported to the House with... - SS
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
- SS Adopted
- Senate Substitute Offered
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 18, 2011, UPON ADJOURNMENT, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 0
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor