+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rural Community Development
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor