+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time