+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on General Laws
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 4, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor