+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor