+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 5
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor