+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 8, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 131 NOES: 19 PRESENT: 2
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 131 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 2
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 1
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 26, 2011, 1:15PM, PERSHING GALLERY
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 0
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor