+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Education
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 107 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 2, HA 3 adopted
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor