+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, April 20, 2017, 9:00am, Senate Lounge
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 93 NOES: 58 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (7)
1189H03.15H
Adopted
1189H03.14H
Adopted
1189H03.08H
Defeated
1189H03.13H
Distributed
1189H03.11H
Distributed
1189H03.06H
Distributed
1189H03.07H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor