+ − Actions (21)
On June 26, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 122 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 1
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 127 NOES: 23
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Aging,Families, Mental & Public Health
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 3
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor