+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor