+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Student Accountability
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (8)
1313H03.11H
Distributed
1313H03.10H
Distributed
1313H03.09H
Distributed
1313H03.06H
Distributed
1313H03.05H
Distributed
1313H03.04H
Distributed
1313H03.03H
Distributed
1313H03.02H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor