+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor