+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 24, 2013, 12:00 p.m., or Upon Morning Recess, Senate Lounge
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 16
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor