+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 118 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 2
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 6, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues
On January 5, 2023 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2023 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (7)
1472H03.10H
Defeated
1472H03.07H
Defeated
1472H03.06H
Distributed
1472H03.05H
Defeated
1472H03.04H
Defeated
1472H03.03H
Defeated
1472H03.02H
Distributed