+ − Actions (26)
On May 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On May 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred: Budget Control Committee
On May 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On May 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
On May 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Pensions and General Laws
On May 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 108 NOES: 044
On April 30, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 26, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review and Government Reform
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On April 25, 2001 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HSA 1 FOR HA 1, HSA 2 FOR HA 2 ADOPTED
- HS Adopted in House
- House Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 24, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Calendar
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 1, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Miscellaneous Bills and Resolutions
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor