+ − Actions (22)
On June 26, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 2
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 149 NOES: 2
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor