+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- HCS#2 Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- HCS#2 Voted Do Pass
- HCS#2 Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to Committee: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor