+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: General Laws
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 7
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor