+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Dropped from Calendar - Rule 44
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Hearing Cancelled
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor