+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 2, 2007, 12:00PM.,SENATE LOUNGE
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 1
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on General Laws
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor