+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 29, 2015, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Perfected
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor