+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Insurance Policy
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor