+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On June 24, 2005 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2005 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 20, 2005 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 2
On April 18, 2005 in the House:
- Perfected
On March 17, 2005 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - NO TIME LIMIT FOR DEBATE
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time