+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, May 6, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 14, 2015, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Perfected
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Insurance
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Property, Casualty, and Life Insurance
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor