+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor