+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 2, 2007, 6:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 2
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor