+ − Actions (22)
On June 26, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 155 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 154 NOES: 0
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Second Rd/Refer: Fin & Govt Org, Vet Affairs & Elections
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 0
On March 10, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor