+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Laid Over - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED/HCS AS AMENDED PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - THREE HOUR TIME LIMIT FOR DEBATE
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time