+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- Laid Over
- SEE COMMENTS - TAKEN UP
On May 10, 2005 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 ADOPTED YEAS: 26 NAYS: 7
- SS Adopted
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On April 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On March 17, 2005 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - NO TIME LIMIT FOR DEBATE
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor