+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 2
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor