+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Third Read and Defeated - AYES: 72 NOES: 82 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Downsizing State Government
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 14, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor