+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor