+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 30, 2013, UPON MORNING RECESS OR ADJOURNMENT, SCR 1
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 156 NOES: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Small Business
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
1450H02.04H
Adopted
1450H02.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor