+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 24, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 156 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 152 NOES: 0
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 15, 2009 1:00P.M. SENATE LOUNGE
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 0
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Homeland Security
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor