+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor