+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Voted Do Pass
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, May 7, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess whichever is later, Senate Lounge
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 30, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess, Senate Lounge
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: General Laws
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 127 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 6
- Taken Up
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Tourism
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0737H01.01H
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor