+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor