+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Reported Do Pass
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 20, 2011, 8:00AM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 8
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time