+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time