+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Small Business
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor