+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0773H02.04H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor