+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Government Affairs
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor